EP4251167 - ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY OF VPS34 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deciphera Pharmaceuticals, LLC 200 Smith Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLYNN, Daniel L. Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21856943.2 | 24.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US60747 | Priority number, date | US202063118512P | 25.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063118512 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022115549 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251167 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5377, A61P31/14 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | 20.06.2023 | ME | 20.06.2023 | Validation states | MA | 20.06.2023 | TN | 20.06.2023 | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE WIRKUNG VON VPS34-INHIBITOREN | [2023/40] | English: | ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY OF VPS34 INHIBITORS | [2023/40] | French: | ACTIVITÉ ANTIVIRALE D'INHIBITEURS DE VPS34 | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2024 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2017140841 (SPRINT BIOSCIENCE AB [SE]) [XD] 1-4,18,41,42 * page 9, line 3-19 and line 29-31; page 16, line 3-9; page 17, line 12-27; page 18, line 11-23 * [Y] 1-58; | [E]WO2022015823 (UNIV GEORGIA STATE RES FOUND [US]) [E] 1-17,41-58* page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 18 *; | [Y] - Silvas Jesus A. ET AL, "Inhibitors of VPS34 and lipid metabolism suppress SARS-CoV-2 replication", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/2020.07.18.210211, (20200720), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/2020.07.18.210211v1.full, (20220222), XP055894508 [Y] 1-58 * page 4, line 69-88; page 9 line 195 - page 10, line 210; page 11, line 232 - page 14, line 306; figure 2, 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/2020.07.18.210211 | [Y] - DANILOSKI ZHARKO ET AL, "Identification of Required Host Factors for SARS-CoV-2 Infection in Human Cells", CELL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 184, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2020.10.030, ISSN 0092-8674, (20201024), page 92, (20201024), XP086441574 [Y] 1-58 * page 97 right-hand column, paragraph; page 102 right-hand column paragraph 2; figures 4E and S4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2020.10.030 | by applicant | WO2017140841 |