EP4202332 - ADJUSTABLE SHELF DEVICE AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Refrigerator Co., Ltd Haier Industry Park Haier Road No. 1 Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road, Laoshan Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Xueli Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhenxing Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Xiaobing Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21857636.1 | 16.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN112833 | Priority number, date | CN202010838194 | 19.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010838194 | [2023/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022037542 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202332 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25D25/02, A47B57/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
F25D25/02 (EP);
F25D25/024 (CN,US);
A47B57/40 (EP);
A47B57/585 (EP);
F25D11/02 (CN);
F25D2325/021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | F25D25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE REGALVORRICHTUNG UND KÜHLSCHRANK DAMIT | [2023/26] | English: | ADJUSTABLE SHELF DEVICE AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING SAME | [2023/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉTAGÈRE RÉGLABLE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR EN ÉTANT ÉQUIPÉ | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | Translation filed | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1705440 (GEMTRON CORP [US]); | [YA]CN207019379U (JIANGSU LEILI MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]EP3318828 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |