EP4187976 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bingzhao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JIN, Zhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21857793.0 | 23.08.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021CN114158 | Priority number, date | CN202010852143 | 21.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010852143 | CN20201152905 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011052905 | [2023/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022037706 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187976 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, H04W52/02, // H04W36/08, H04W48/08, H04W48/16 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP);
H04W48/02 (CN,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,CN);
H04W48/16 (EP,CN);
H04W52/0212 (CN);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0225 (CN);
H04W52/0254 (EP);
H04W52/0258 (EP);
H04W52/0261 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | H04W36/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/22] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2023 | Translation filed | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008268878 (WANG JIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9] , [0 13] , [0 16] , [0 19] , [0 30] , [0 31] , [0 35] , [0 39] , [0 40] , [0 69] , [0 88]; figures 2, 4, 5; claim 1 * [Y] 2,5,12; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network;Improvement of the Multimedia Broadcast Multicast Service (MBMS) in UTRAN (Release 7)", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-063643 TR25905V200, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070109), vol. RAN WG2, no. Riga, Latvia; 20070109, XP050133055 [X] 1,8,13-15 * page 16 * | [Y] - HUAWEI (MODERATOR), "Summary of moderated email discussion on Rel-17 NR Multicast Broadcast", vol. TSG RAN, no. Newport Beach, USA; 20190916 - 20190920, (20190909), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-191859_SUMMARY OF MODERATED EMAIL DISCUSSION ON REL-17 NR MULTICAST BROADCAST, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/TSG_RAN/TSGR_85/Docs/RP-191859.zip, (20190909), XP051782405 [Y] 2 * section 2.2.5 * | [Y] - OPPO, "Higher priority frequency searching relaxes for UE power saving", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, USA; 20190413 - 20190417, (20190430), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1905594- HIGHER PRIORITY FREQUENCY SEARCHING RELAXES FOR UE POWER SAVING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F106/Docs/R2%2D1905594%2Ezip, (20190430), XP051709952 [Y] 5,12 * section 2 * |