EP4190377 - PRE-FILLED SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONO Yohei Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi 409-3853 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU Makoto Yamaguchi-shi, Yamaguchi 754-0894 / JP | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21858340.9 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021JP30194 | Priority number, date | JP20200139686 | 20.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020139686 | [2023/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039196 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190377 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, A61M5/315, A61M5/50, A61M5/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/31511 (EP);
A61M5/3129 (US);
A61M5/31513 (US);
A61M5/31515 (EP);
A61M2205/582 (US);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/584 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | A61M5/31, A61M5/315, A61M5/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VORGEFÜLLTE SPRITZE | [2023/23] | English: | PRE-FILLED SYRINGE | [2023/23] | French: | SERINGUE PRÉ-REMPLIE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | Translation filed | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014122782 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0041] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 1-3,5 *; | [XI]WO2017214388 (BRELL MEDICAL INNOVATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * paragraphs [1070] , [1077] , [1080] - [1082] - [1085] , [1087]; figures 8-25 * [I] 5,8,10 | International search | [AY]JP2006187336 (NIPRO CORP) [A] 4, 7, 9-10 [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8; | [A]JP2010246842 (USUI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-10* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010268883 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire text, all drawings *; | [AY]JP2018510688 (FRESENIUS KABI AUSTRIA GMBH ) [A] 4, 7, 9-10 [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8; | [A]JP2018061832 (UNL HOLDINGS LLC) [A] 1-10 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2019063168 (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0020]-[0024] *; | [AY]JP2019520927 (SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [A] 4, 7, 9-10 [Y] 1-3, 5-6, 8 | by applicant | WO9413340 | US5370621 | US5472431 |