EP4199781 - CURLING IRON WITH ION EMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conair LLC One Cummings Point Road Stamford, CT 06902 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIU, Kwan, Shing, Benny Tseung Kwan O, NT / HK | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | AWA Benelux Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme - Bât. K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21858835.8 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US45354 | Priority number, date | US202016996051 | 18.08.2020 Original published format: US202016996051 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039975 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199781 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A45D4/12, A45D1/04, A45D2/36, A45D4/18, A45D4/16, A45D1/16 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP,GB,US);
A45D1/16 (EP);
A45D2/36 (GB);
A45D4/12 (GB);
A45D4/16 (GB);
A45D4/18 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | A45D4/12, A45D1/04, A45D2/36, A45D4/18, A45D4/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | LOCKENSTAB MIT IONENEMITTER | [2023/26] | English: | CURLING IRON WITH ION EMITTER | [2023/26] | French: | FER À BOUCLER AVEC ÉMETTEUR D'IONS | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4075458 (MOYER ALAN RAY); | [XY]US2005224091 (CAFARO MICHAEL [US], et al) |