EP4178685 - FILTER SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transportation IP Holdings, LLC 901 Main Avenue Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEHER, Brett Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | 02 /
LOCKE, Douglas Lee Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | 03 /
COYNE, Jennifer Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | 04 /
BARNES, John E. Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21859017.2 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021US46413 | Priority number, date | US202063068122P | 20.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063068122 P | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022040254 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178685 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A62B7/10, A62B7/12, A62B23/02, B01D46/24, B01D50/20 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A62B23/02 (EP,US);
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
B01D46/24 (EP);
B01D50/20 (EP);
B03C3/15 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | A62B7/10, A62B7/12, A62B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | FILTERSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/20] | English: | FILTER SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/20] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102007020717 (TOMZAK E [DE]); | [XAI]US7559965 (OH JANG-KEUN [KR], et al); | [X]US2018036746 (ANTOMON CHOWALLOOR RAPHEAL [IN], et al) | International search | [A]US2009265883 (REED JR CHARLES A [US], et al); | [A]WO2012137655 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2013255203 (MUENKEL KARLHEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]CN105597460 (MIDEA GROUP CO LTD); | [A]US2020206672 (VALLEJO ALEJANDRO E [US], et al) | by applicant | US7559965 |