EP4080070 - KNOB LOCK, MAINTENANCE TOOL AND LED DISPLAY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilumin Group Co., Ltd. Building A, 112, Yongfu Rd. Qiaotou Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Falong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Kuang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Pinglin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Osterhoff, Utz Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstraße 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 21859909.0 | 08.07.2021 | [2022/43] | WO2021CN105240 | Priority number, date | CN202021801457U | 25.08.2020 Original published format: CN 202021801457 U | [2022/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042069 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080070 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/10, F16M11/04, G09F9/33, F16B21/02, G09F9/302 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G09F9/33 (EP);
H05K5/0017 (US);
F16B1/00 (US);
F16B21/02 (EP);
F16B5/10 (EP);
F16M11/041 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | F16B5/10, F16M11/04, G09F9/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | DREHKNOPFVERRIEGELUNG, WARTUNGSWERKZEUG UND LED-ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM | [2022/43] | English: | KNOB LOCK, MAINTENANCE TOOL AND LED DISPLAY SCREEN | [2022/43] | French: | VERROU DE BOUTON, OUTIL DE MAINTENANCE ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE À DEL | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | Translation filed | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN203297209U (SHENZHEN ABSEN OPTOELECTRONIC CO LTD) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [XY]US9845816 (BRASHNYK NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [A]US10626961 (HEO JINHA [KR], et al) [A] 1* figures 1-18 * |