EP4207793 - OTN NETWORK RESOURCE OPTIMIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Dajiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YE, Youdao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhenyu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21860102.9 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021CN111209 | Priority number, date | CN202010899413 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010899413 | [2023/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042262 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207793 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L41/0823, H04L41/16 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0062 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0067 (CN);
H04J3/1652 (US);
H04L41/0823 (EP);
H04L41/16 (EP);
H04Q11/0005 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | H04Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | OTN-NETZWERKRESSOURCENOPTIMIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/27] | English: | OTN NETWORK RESOURCE OPTIMIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMPUTER DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'OPTIMISATION DE RESSOURCES DE RÉSEAU OTN, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | Translation filed | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1540934 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |