EP4197457 - HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION APPARATUS, HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION TREATMENT APPARATUS, AND HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MicroPort NeuroTech (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Building 16 222 GuangDan Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201318 / CN | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Shuang Shanghai 201318 / CN | 02 /
CHANG, Mengqi Shanghai 201318 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Bing Shanghai 201318 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Yuanyi Shanghai 201318 / CN | 05 /
DENG, Shuhao Shanghai 201318 / CN | 06 /
LU, Huina Shanghai 201318 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21860184.7 | 13.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021CN112628 | Priority number, date | CN202010899258 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010899258 | [2023/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042346 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197457 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/12113 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12109 (EP);
A61B17/12168 (EP);
A61B17/12172 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12177 (CN);
A61B2017/00867 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR OKKLUSION VON HÄMANGIOMEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HÄMANGIOMVERSCHLÜSSEN UND SYSTEM ZUR OKKLUSION VON HÄMANGIOMEN | [2023/25] | English: | HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION APPARATUS, HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION TREATMENT APPARATUS, AND HEMANGIOMA OCCLUSION SYSTEM | [2023/25] | French: | APPAREIL D'OCCLUSION D'HÉMANGIOME, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'OCCLUSION D'HÉMANGIOME ET SYSTÈME D'OCCLUSION D'HÉMANGIOME | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | Translation filed | 17.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3456272 (MICROVENTION INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-12,14 * figure 15 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] , [0070] *[I] 3,4,15 |