Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
03.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
08.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
23.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.12.2022 | Change - representative | |
23.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |