EP4205764 - ANTI-TRUNCATED MUTANT CALR-CD3 BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juntendo Educational Foundation 2-1-1, Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | For all designated states Meiji Seika Pharma Co., Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Norio Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | 02 /
ARAKI, Marito Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | 03 /
KIHARA, Yoshihiko Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | 04 /
ISHIDA, Yoji Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | 05 /
KITAMURA, Koichi Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | 06 /
FUKUSHIMA, Takayoshi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0852 / JP | 07 /
YASUI, Kaori Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21861669.6 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021JP31355 | Priority number, date | JP20200143551 | 27.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020143551 | [2023/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022045247 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205764 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/46, C12N15/13, A61K51/10, G01N33/53, G01N33/531 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/395 (IL);
C07K16/18 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/28 (IL,US);
A61K51/10 (IL);
A61P35/02 (IL,KR);
C07K16/00 (IL);
C07K16/2809 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/46 (IL);
G01N33/53 (IL);
G01N33/531 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N33/574 (KR);
G01N33/57426 (EP);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/30 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2333/4727 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Extension states | BA | 16.03.2023 | ME | 16.03.2023 | Validation states | KH | 16.03.2023 | MA | 16.03.2023 | MD | 16.03.2023 | TN | 16.03.2023 | Title | German: | ANTI-TRUNKIERTER MUTANTER BISPEZIFISCHER CALR-CD3-ANTIKÖRPER UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/27] | English: | ANTI-TRUNCATED MUTANT CALR-CD3 BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2023/27] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUE CALR-CD3 MUTANT ANTI-TRONQUÉ ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2023 | Translation filed | 01.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2016537012 (CEMM - FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN GMBH) [Y] 1-22 * claims, paragraph [0168], example 2 *; | [Y]US2017269092 (KRALOVICS ROBERT [AT]) [Y] 1-22 * claims, example 1, tables *; | [PY]WO2020175689 (JUNTENDO EDUCATIONAL FOUND [JP], et al) [PY] 1-22* claims, examples *; | [Y] - Izumi Kumagai , Ryutaro Asano, "Human bispecific antibody that recognizes lymphocytes and cancer cells", Drug Delivery System, (20080101), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.2745/dds.23.518, ISSN 0913-5006, pages 518 - 525, XP055108472 [Y] 1-22 * p. 521, fig. 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2745/dds.23.518 | [A] - Vannucchi A M, Rotunno G, Bartalucci N, Raugei G, Carrai V, Balliu M, Mannarelli C, Pacilli A, Calabresi L, Fjerza R, Pieri , Bosi A, Manfredini R, Guglielmelli P, "Calreticulin mutation-specific immunostaining in myeloproliferative neoplasms: pathogenetic insight and diagnostic value", Leukemia, London, (20140901), vol. 28, no. 9, doi:10.1038/leu.2014.100, ISSN 0887-6924, pages 1811 - 1818, XP002733584 [A] 1-22 * abstract, results, fig. 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2014.100 | by applicant | JPH0159878B | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9220791 | WO9306213 | WO9311236 | WO9312227 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | WO9501438 | WO9515388 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9954440 | WO2015036599 | JP2015110628 | WO2016087514 | JP2017137329 | JP2019022497 | WO2019178362 | - KLAMPFL TGISSLINGER HHARUTYUNYAN AS et al., "Somatic mutations of calreticulin in myeloproliferative neoplasms", The New England journal of medicine, (20130000), vol. 369, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1311347, pages 2379 - 90, XP002733585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1311347 | - NANGALIA JMASSIE CEBAXTER EJ et al., "Somatic CALR mutations in myeloproliferative neoplasms with nonmutated JAK2", The New England journal of medicine, (20130000), vol. 369, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1312542, pages 2391 - 405, XP055148137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1312542 | - ARAKI MYANG YMASUBUCHI N et al., "Activation of the thrombopoietin receptor by mutant calreticulin in CALR-mutant myeloproliferative neoplasms", Blood, (20160000), vol. 127, pages 1307 - 16 | - ELF SABDELFATTAH NSCHEN E et al., "Mutant Calreticulin Requires Both Its Mutant C-terminus and the Thrombopoietin Receptor for Oncogenic Transformation", Cancer Discov, (20160000), vol. 6, doi:10.1158/2159-8290.CD-15-1434, pages 368 - 81, XP055527242 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2159-8290.CD-15-1434 | - MARTY CPECQUET CNIVARTHI H et al., "Calreticulin mutants in mice induce an MPL-dependent thrombocytosis with frequent progression to myelofibrosis", Blood, (20160000), vol. 127, doi:10.1182/blood-2015-11-679571, pages 1317 - 24, XP055527263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2015-11-679571 | - VAINCHENKER WKRALOVICS R, "Genetic basis and molecular pathophysiology of classical myeloproliferative neoplasms", Blood, (20170000), vol. 129, doi:10.1182/blood-2016-10-695940, pages 667 - 79, XP086677972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2016-10-695940 |