EP4204163 - SELF REGULATING FLUID BEARING HIGH PRESSURE ROTARY RETARDER NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stoneage, Inc. 466 S. Skylane Drive Durango, Colorado 81303 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZABO, Daniel Durango, Colorado 81301 / US | 02 /
WRIGHT, Douglas E. Durango, Colorado 81303 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21862620.8 | 25.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47456 | Priority number, date | US202063070953P | 27.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063070953 P | US202163159666P | 11.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163159666 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022046842 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204163 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/00, B05B3/10, F16D57/00, B05B3/06, F16F9/06, B05B15/18 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B05B3/06 (EP,US);
B05B3/0463 (US);
B05B15/18 (EP,US);
B05B3/002 (EP,US);
B05B3/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | B05B3/00, B05B3/10, F16D57/00, B05B3/06, F16F9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | SELBSTREGULIERENDE FLUIDLAGERDÜSE FÜR EINEN HOCHDRUCK-DREHVERZÖGERER | [2023/27] | English: | SELF REGULATING FLUID BEARING HIGH PRESSURE ROTARY RETARDER NOZZLE | [2023/27] | French: | BUSE RETARDATRICE ROTATIVE HAUTE PRESSION À PALIER FLUIDE AUTORÉGULATEUR | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/27] | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/27] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees IS, CY, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LU, LT, IT, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL, LV | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2023 | Decision despatched | 21.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5909848 (ZINK GERALD P [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-13 * abstract * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 61 *; | [Y]US7635096 (WRIGHT DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 5, line 18 *; | [A]KR20180063539 (NOH MI KYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [Y]US5909848 (ZINK GERALD P [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 14; and figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2003071141 (RIEBEN KARL [CH]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0034]-[0050]; and figures 1-4 *; | [DY]US7635096 (WRIGHT DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [DY] 1-20 * claim 1; and figures 1-2 *; | [Y]KR101590576B (KOREA PREC MACHINING CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4-5,9-20 * paragraph [0016]; and figure 3 *; | [A]KR20180063539 (NOH MI KYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0023]-[0066]; and figures 1-6 * |