Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4205496 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180070401 EP21862738 US2021047756W US202118043022



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023328772Global Dossier 12.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202118043022 26.08.2021
WO2021US47756 26.08.2021
US202063070398 26.08.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116391389Global Dossier 04.07.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2021US47756 26.08.2021
US202063070398 26.08.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4205496Global Dossier 07.08.2024A4
EP4205496 05.07.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US47756 26.08.2021
US202063070398 26.08.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022047032Global Dossier 03.03.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202063070398 26.08.2020