EP4204404 - ALPHA1A-ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curasen Therapeutics, Inc. 930 Brittan Avenue, 306 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, David Scott San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
O'YANG, Counde San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 03 /
FORD, Anthony P. San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Wei San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21862751.1 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47779 | Priority number, date | US202063071297P | 27.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063071297 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022047052 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204404 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/06, A61P25/28, A61K31/4178, A61K31/427, A61K31/422, A61K31/4164, C07D233/20, C07D233/22, C07D233/24, C07D233/26, C07D401/10, C07D403/06, C07D403/10, C07D403/14, C07D405/06, C07D405/10, C07D409/10, C07D417/10, C07D413/10 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
C07D403/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4178 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR);
C07D233/06 (EP);
C07D233/20 (EP,KR);
C07D233/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/24 (EP,KR);
C07D233/26 (EP,KR);
C07D401/10 (EP,KR);
C07D403/06 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,KR);
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,KR);
C07D409/10 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | C07D233/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | ALPHA1A-ADRENERGE REZEPTORAGONISTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/27] | English: | ALPHA1A-ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND METHODS OF USE | [2023/27] | French: | AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR ALPHA1A-ADRÉNERGIQUE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 19.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5952362 (COURNOYER RICHARD LEO [US], et al); | [XA]US2007197621 (GALLEY GUIDO [DE], et al); | [A]US2009197933 (O'YANG COUNDE [US], et al); | [A]WO2009098136 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [A]US2019117623 (SIMPSON JR PAUL C [US], et al) |