EP4187489 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING BLOOD VESSEL DIAMETER IN FUNDUS IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Sibright Technology Co., Ltd. 901, Building No.3, Tingwei Business Park No.6 Liufang Rd., Xin'an Avenue Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Juan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
XIA, Bin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21863241.2 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021CN91223 | Priority number, date | CN202010924287 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010924287 | [2023/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048171 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187489 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/62, G06T7/12, G06T7/155, G06T3/40 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/62 (EP,CN,US);
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (CN);
G06T7/155 (EP);
G06T2207/20021 (US);
G06T2207/20044 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30041 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/30096 (US);
G06T2207/30101 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/30172 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | G06T7/62, G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES BLUTGEFÄSSDURCHMESSERS IM FUNDUSBILD | [2023/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING BLOOD VESSEL DIAMETER IN FUNDUS IMAGE | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE DU DIAMÈTRE DE VAISSEAU SANGUIN DANS UNE IMAGE DE RÉTINOPHOTOGRAPHIE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2023 | Translation filed | 21.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9924867 (ABRAMOFF MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [Y]CN109166124 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH); | International search | [A]US2017100029 (FABER JAMES E [US]); | [Y]CN108537789 (UNIV SHENZHEN); | [Y]CN110310323 (UNIV TIANJIN POLYTECHNIC); | [PX]CN112288794 (SHENZHEN SILICON BASED INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) |