EP4199489 - INTERFACE DISPLAY METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Liwei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YU, Binke Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Haiyan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21863468.1 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021CN111323 | Priority number, date | CN202010930870 | 07.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010930870 | [2023/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048401 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199489 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06F9/451, G06F21/36, H04M1/72454, H04W52/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04M1/72454 (EP,CN);
G09G3/293 (US);
G06F1/3265 (EP);
G06F1/3293 (EP);
G06F21/36 (EP);
G06F9/451 (EP,CN);
H04W52/0267 (EP,CN);
G09G2310/0245 (US);
G09G2320/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H04M1/725, G06F9/451 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/25] | English: | INTERFACE DISPLAY METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'INTERFACE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | Translation filed | 16.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018240260 (LEE JAEMYOUNG [KR], et al); | [E]WO2022242422 (HONOR DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) |