EP4203346 - BROADCAST SIGNAL PLAYING METHOD, MAP GENERATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Derun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CUI, Xiushuai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Guicheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21863581.1 | 30.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN115347 | Priority number, date | CN202010921926 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010921926 | [2023/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048516 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203346 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04H40/27, // H04H20/24 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04H60/70 (EP,CN);
H04H20/57 (CN,US);
H04H60/78 (US);
H04H20/20 (EP);
H04H20/26 (EP);
H04H40/54 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | H04H40/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | RUNDFUNKSIGNALWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN, KARTENERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/26] | English: | BROADCAST SIGNAL PLAYING METHOD, MAP GENERATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE CARTE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2023 | Translation filed | 21.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 08.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3142371 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC [JP]) [A] 9-11,13* figure 6 *; | [XI]WO2020040778 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,12,14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0024] , [0054] - [0059] - [0070] * [I] 6,9-11,13 |