EP4191180 - DRYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI SHOJI CO., LTD. 60, Hirakata 13-chome Fukujucho Hashima-shi Gifu, 501-6257 / JP | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA Tatsumi Hashima-shi, Gifu 501-6257 / JP | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21864138.9 | 20.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021JP30557 | Priority number, date | JP20200147922 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020147922 | [2023/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050080 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191180 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F26B5/04, A61F13/53, B09B3/00, F26B3/347, F26B5/14, F26B21/10, F26B5/06 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B09B3/50 (EP);
F26B3/347 (EP,US);
F26B21/10 (EP);
F26B5/04 (EP);
F26B5/048 (EP,US);
F26B5/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | F26B5/04, A61F13/53, B09B3/00, F26B3/347, F26B5/14, F26B21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/23] | English: | DRYING METHOD | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCHAGE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2023 | Translation filed | 01.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS5135155 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * pages 260-261; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]JPH10281642 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016]; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]JP2003090678 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020]; figures 1-2 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]WO2006077656 (YAGI SHUNICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * pages 6-9; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]US9459044 (HADDOCK REX C [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 3-4; figures 1-9 *[I] 2-9 | International search | [YAX]JPS5135155 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 7-9 * claims, p. 2, upper left column, line 16 to p. 3, upper right column, line 7, fig. 1-3 * * claims, p. 2, upper left column, line 16 to p. 3, upper right column, line 7, fig. 1-3 * [A] 4-5 [X] 1-3, 6; | [A]JPS5735277 (UEMURA SOUZABUROU) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JPH02124488U [A] 1-9; | [A]JPH0483573 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2001054730 (ERII KK) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]KR101184125B (KIM CHANG KI [KR], et al) [Y] 8-9 * claims, paragraphs [0032]-[0043] *; | [Y]JP2013221667 (KYUSHU INST TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 7 * claims, paragraphs [0003], [0021]-[0030] *; | [A]JP2016220635 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2020085346 (EARTH TECHNICA KK) [A] 1-9 * entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP4474506B | JP2020085346 |