EP4209557 - INKJET INK AND TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPPAN INC. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSEKI, Seiya Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Hideki Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 03 /
HOSHINO, Yuichi Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 04 /
SAITO, Masatoshi Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21864186.8 | 24.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021JP30984 | Priority number, date | JP20200149380 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020149380 | [2023/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050128 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209557 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/328, C09D11/14, C09D11/38, A61K9/44 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/20 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/28] | C09D11/328, A61K9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLTINTE UND TABLETTE | [2023/28] | English: | INKJET INK AND TABLET | [2023/28] | French: | ENCRE POUR JET D'ENCRE ET COMPRIMÉ | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2022 | Translation filed | 27.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2019142495 (SCREEN HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10* paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054]; example -; tables 3,4 * | International search | [A]JPH08325495 (DOMINO PRINTING SCIENCES PLC) [A] 1-10 * entire text *; | [Y]JP2007031495 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]JP2012111824 (UNION CHEMICAR CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire text *; | [A]JP2015218144 (KISHU GIKEN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10* entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2018100336 (SCREEN HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0056], [0067], [0072]-[0075], [0085], [0100], tables 1, 4, 20, examples 16, 18 *; | [Y]JP2020029537 (KISHU GIKEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]JP2020070416 (SCREEN HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2020084000 (MIKUNI COLOR LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0029] * |