EP4170181 - PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATA, Ryo Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Masaharu Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Masamitsu Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 04 /
HIRAKI, Hiromichi Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21864327.8 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021JP31916 | Priority number, date | JP20200148970 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020148970 | [2023/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050269 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170181 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/22, F01D15/08, F04D13/04 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
F01D15/10 (EP);
F04D29/4293 (US);
F01D11/001 (EP);
F01D11/04 (EP);
F01D15/08 (EP);
F02M37/12 (EP,US);
F04D1/00 (US);
F04D13/043 (EP,US);
F04D29/167 (EP);
F04D29/22 (EP);
F04D29/24 (US);
F04D29/588 (EP);
F02C3/045 (EP,US);
F02C3/073 (EP,US);
F02C7/22 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | F04D29/24, F01D15/08, F04D13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | PUMPVORRICHTUNG | [2023/17] | English: | PUMP DEVICE | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TYPE POMPE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2023 | Translation filed | 19.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 14.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE309856 (M.KNÖRLEIN) [X] 1,8,9 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 60 * [A] 2-7; | [Y]US5073335 (TOWNSEND HAROLD E [US]) [Y] 1 * figure 3 * * column 4, line 19 - column 7, line 2 *; | [Y]US7828511 (PINERA ALEX [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 3 ** column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 19 * | International search | [A]JP2020509296 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES) [A] 1-9* entire text, fig. 1 * | by applicant | JP2007205353 | JP4115902B | JP2020148970 |