EP4209284 - FLUX CLEANING AGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBA, Hiroya Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
TERUYA, Yuta Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA, Shingo Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21864434.2 | 03.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021JP32460 | Priority number, date | JP20200149279 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020149279 | [2023/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022050382 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209284 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/08, C11D7/34, C11D7/50, H05K3/34 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
C23G1/18 (EP,KR);
C11D7/34 (KR);
B08B3/08 (KR);
C11D3/0042 (EP);
C11D3/044 (EP);
C11D3/30 (EP);
C11D3/3427 (EP);
C11D3/3472 (EP);
C11D3/43 (EP);
C11D7/04 (KR);
C11D7/22 (KR);
C11D7/50 (KR);
C23G1/20 (EP,KR);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H05K3/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | FLUSSMITTELREINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/28] | English: | FLUX CLEANING AGENT COMPOSITION | [2023/28] | French: | COMPOSITION D'AGENT DE NETTOYAGE DE FLUX | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2023 | Translation filed | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002012896 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]WO2005021700 (KAKEN TECH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017119782 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2018177974 (JSR CORP); | [PA]KR20200106771 (EXTOL CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO2005021700 | JP2015216276 | JP2020035721 | JP2020074498 |