EP4297136 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE FOR BATTERIES AND OTHER USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diaz-Crespo Valdes, Jorge C/ Progreso 1, 3º 7ª 12530 Burriana Cast. de la Plana / ES | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 21866156.9 | 13.01.2021 | [2023/52] | WO2021IB50207 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053877 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | ES | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297136 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/1016 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01M8/1016 (EP,ES);
H01M10/0565 (EP);
H01M10/26 (EP);
H01M10/36 (EP);
H01M2300/0085 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT FÜR BATTERIEN UND ANDERE ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/52] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE FOR BATTERIES AND OTHER USES | [2023/52] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE POUR DES BATTERIES ET D'AUTRES APPLICATIONS | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | Translation filed | 01.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/52] | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | 07.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.08.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2718539 (BRADSHAW BENJAMIN C, et al) [A] 1-3* , claims 1 and 5. *; | [A]JPS4844295B [A] 1-3 * , abstract [on line] retrieved from EPODOC/EPO and WPI/DERWENT, paragraph [0003]. *; | [X]CN106207219 (HU CHUNYU) [X] 1-3 * , abstract [on line] retrieved from EPODOC/EPO and WPI/DERWENT, claims 1-8. * | [A] - JIAN, TIGER HAOZHE, "Building a Better Battery: Ionic Conductivity of Granular Hydrate Crystals", Journal of Student Science and Technology, (20150000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 48 - 54 [A] 1-3 * Abstract, Materials and method. * |