Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4297136
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.03.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
19.01.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
22.11.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
17.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
07.11.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|