Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022053877 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2023 | A4 | WO2022053877 | 17.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB50207 | 13.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4297136 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB50207 | 13.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2956446R | 12.02.2024 | R1 | ES2956446 | 21.12.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB50207 | 13.01.2021 |