Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
22.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
22.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
17.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
16.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
16.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
22.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
31.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |