EP4213083 - SYSTEM FOR MANAGING STORAGE STATUS DATA AND PROOF OF OWNERSHIP FOR LIQUOR IN UNITS OF BARRELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicask Co., Ltd. 1-6-1 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Youzao Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Katsuhiko Tokyo 103-0021 / JP | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Vesterinen, Jussi Tapio LUMI IP GmbH Rodtmattstrasse 45 3014 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21866303.7 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021JP19282 | Priority number, date | JP20200150959 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020150959 | [2023/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022054342 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213083 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/018, G06Q10/08, G06Q30/06, G06Q50/10, H04L9/00, G06Q40/04, G06Q50/04 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (US);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q30/018 (EP);
G06Q50/04 (EP);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/3213 (US);
H04L9/3263 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/29] | G06Q10/08, G06Q30/06, G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON LAGERSTATUSDATEN UND ZUM NACHWEIS DER EIGENTÜMERSCHAFT VON LIKÖR IN EINHEITEN VON FÄSSERN | [2023/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MANAGING STORAGE STATUS DATA AND PROOF OF OWNERSHIP FOR LIQUOR IN UNITS OF BARRELS | [2023/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DONNÉES D'ÉTAT DE STOCKAGE ET D'UNE PREUVE DE PROPRIÉTÉ D'UN SPIRITUEUX DANS DES UNITÉS DE FÛTS | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2023 | Translation filed | 28.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019340623 (RIVKIND OLEKSANDR [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] - [0033] - [0 39] - [0088] *; | [A]WO2020044211 (RICCA LORENZO [CH]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]US2020259658 (LIBSCH FRANK R [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * figures 2-5, 9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 23] - [0139] * | International search | [A]JP2019198251 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-9* entire text * | by applicant | - Buying Whiskey by the Barrel! The Joy of Buying Like a Connoisseur | - The Ultimate Connoisseur Buying Guide! Can I Buy One Entire Barrel of Whiskey? |