EP4212768 - LUBRICATING OIL SUPPLY DEVICE AND ROTATION TEST APPARATUS EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinfonia Technology Co., Ltd. 1-30, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGURA Manabu Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21866524.8 | 24.08.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021JP30963 | Priority number, date | JP20200152740 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020152740 | [2023/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022054564 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212768 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/32, G01M17/007, F16N7/38, F16N29/02, F16C19/04, F16C33/66, F16N19/00, G01M13/025, G01M15/02 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
G01M13/025 (EP,US);
F16N31/00 (KR);
F16N7/32 (EP,KR,US);
F16C33/6662 (EP);
F16N19/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16N29/02 (EP);
F16N7/38 (EP);
G01M15/02 (EP);
G01M17/007 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/29] | F16N7/32, G01M17/007 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE ROTATIONSTESTVORRICHTUNG | [2023/29] | English: | LUBRICATING OIL SUPPLY DEVICE AND ROTATION TEST APPARATUS EQUIPPED THEREWITH | [2023/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN HUILE DE LUBRIFICATION ET APPAREIL D'ESSAI DE ROTATION ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | Translation filed | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPS416329Y ; | [A]JPH10252755 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [AY]JP2003130286 (TACO CO LTD); | [AY]JP2005024093 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [Y]JP2019028041 (SINFONIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | by applicant | JP3924980B | JP2019028041 |