EP4212490 - LI2O-AL2O3-SIO2-BASED CRYSTALLIZED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Electric Glass Co., Ltd. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8639 / JP | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOTA, Yuki Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Yusuke Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Takahiro Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21866698.0 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021JP32579 | Priority number, date | JP20200153032 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020153032 | [2023/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022054739 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212490 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/12 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C03C3/097 (EP,KR);
C03C10/0027 (EP,KR);
C03C10/0009 (US);
C03C10/0045 (EP);
C03C10/0054 (US);
C03C3/083 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | KRISTALLISIERTES GLAS AUF LI2O-AL2O3-SIO2-BASIS | [2023/29] | English: | LI2O-AL2O3-SIO2-BASED CRYSTALLIZED GLASS | [2023/29] | French: | VERRE CRISTALLISÉ À BASE DE LI2O-AL2O3-SIO2 | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 02.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPH05193985 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 5, 7, 13-14, 26 [Y] 1-4, 6, 8-12, 15-25; | [YAX]JP2001048583 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [Y] 1-4, 6, 8-12, 15-25 [A] 26 [X] 1-15, 19-25; | [A]JP2010510952 (EUROKERA) [A] 1-26 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2012041260 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [A] 1-26* entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2015074596 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [Y] 16-18 * paragraphs [0028], [0029] *; | [A]JP2016020303 (EUROKERA) [A] 1-26 * entire text, all drawings *; | [AX]JP2019112299 (SCHOTT AG) [A] 1-25 [X] 26; | [A]WO2020100490 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [A] 1-26 * entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JPS3921049B | JPS4020182B | JPH01308845 | JPH11228180 | JPH11228181 |