EP4155748 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/13] | BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[2024/27] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/33] |
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Hee-Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Yoon-Jung Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHA, A-Ming Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/33] |
Former [2023/13] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21867129.5 | 08.09.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021KR12246 | Priority number, date | KR20200115637 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200115637 | [2023/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022055264 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155748 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4155748 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392, G01R31/367, G01R31/36, G01R19/165, G01R19/30, G01R31/382, H01M10/48, H01M10/42, H01M10/44 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/367 (KR,US);
G01R19/16566 (KR);
G01R19/30 (KR);
G01R31/3648 (KR);
G01R31/382 (KR);
G01R31/3835 (US);
H01M10/42 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0047 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | G01R31/392, G01R31/367, G01R31/36, G01R19/165, G01R19/30, G01R31/382, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2024/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE BATTERIES | [2023/13] |
Former [2023/13] | BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | Translation filed | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013119940 (IRIYAMA JIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2016195589 (HANYU YUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2016254687 (TANAKA AKIHIDE [JP], et al); | [A]EP3696903 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2012054220 (NEC ENERGY DEVICES LTD, et al); | [A]JP5287872B ; | [A]JP5354416B ; | [A]KR20160026766 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]KR20190118529 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20130142884 | KR20200115637 |