EP4211489 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SIMULTANEOUS RANGE-RATE UNWRAPPING AND OUTLIER REMOVAL FOR RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argo AI, LLC 2545 Railroad St, Suite 400 Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Xiufeng Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard Bonsmann . Bonsmann . Frank Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21867422.4 | 07.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021US49233 | Priority number, date | US202017016558 | 10.09.2020 Original published format: US202017016558 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022055847 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211489 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/58, G01S13/87, G01S13/931, G01S13/89 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
G01S13/584 (EP);
G01S13/70 (US);
G01S13/87 (EP);
G01S13/89 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G05D1/0212 (US);
G06F18/2433 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G01S7/358 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
G06T2207/30252 (US);
G06V20/58 (EP);
G06V20/64 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/29] | G01S7/292, G01S7/40, G01S13/89, G01S13/50, G06T7/11, G01S13/931 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN AUSWICKLUNG UND AUSREISSERBESEITIGUNG DER ENTFERNUNGSRATE FÜR RADAR | [2023/29] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SIMULTANEOUS RANGE-RATE UNWRAPPING AND OUTLIER REMOVAL FOR RADAR | [2023/29] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS SIMULTANÉS DE DÉROULEMENT DE LA VITESSE RADIALE ET DE SUPPRESSION DES VALEURS ABERRANTES POUR RADAR | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014072220 (GOODMAN VERNON R [US], et al); | [A]US2018108146 (ZHAN JUN [CN], et al); | [A]US2018335787 (ZENG SHUQING [US], et al); | [A]US2019302259 (VAN FLEET CHAD M [US], et al); | [A]US2020132850 (CROUCH STEPHEN C [US], et al) |