EP4215975 - HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVCKenwood Corporation 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2210022 / JP | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA Ken Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21868917.2 | 02.03.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021JP07913 | Priority number, date | JP20200155196 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020155196 | [2023/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022059229 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215975 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, B60K35/23, B60K35/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/23 (EP,US);
G02B27/01 (EP);
G02B27/0103 (EP);
B60K2360/23 (EP,US);
B60K2360/29 (EP,US);
B60K2360/334 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | HEAD-UP-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | Translation filed | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 07.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0631167 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]US5708413 (OKUYAMA HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012250306 (SUGIYAMA KEIJI [JP], et al); | [E]US2022382211 (PINSKER MARTIN [DE], et al) | International search | [X]JPS6438718 (HORUTORONIKU G FUR HOROGURAFUI, et al); | [A]JPH0784511 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JPH11271536 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009251004 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [YA]JP2010113172 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2011197351 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2016012108 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]US9804482 (ROSSINI UMBERTO [FR], et al) | by applicant | JPH07285357 | JP2020155196 |