EP4215779 - SEALING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroka Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 02 /
HAMAMOTO, Kokichi Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 03 /
NAGAHAMAYA, Hideaki Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Yuki Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIOKA, Kenya Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1193 / JP | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21869047.7 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021JP28204 | Priority number, date | JP20200154931 | 15.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020154931 | [2023/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022059360 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215779 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/3204, F16J15/3244 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F16J15/3244 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/3204 (EP,KR);
F16J15/3212 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | SEALING DEVICE | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | Translation filed | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1019135 (KOYO SHIKAGOROOHAIDO KK); | [X]JP2001173798 (ARAI PUMP MFG); | [A]JP2005172061 (NOK CORP); | [A]WO2015053170 (NOK CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2020045070 (NOK CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP3278349B |