EP4199483 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING DISPLAY MODULE HAVING PLURALITY OF FPCBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Daeseung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21869723.3 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021KR12627 | Priority number, date | KR20200118523 | 15.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200118523 | [2023/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022060101 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199483 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H05K1/14, H01M10/04, G06F1/16, G06F1/18, H01M10/42, H05K1/18 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04M1/0277 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/0266 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1635 (KR);
G06F1/1637 (EP,KR);
G06F1/183 (KR);
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M10/0431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H04M1/0262 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/0274 (US);
H05K1/14 (EP);
H05K1/147 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/189 (EP);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H04M1/02, H05K1/14, H01M10/04, G06F1/16, G06F1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ANZEIGEMODUL MIT MEHREREN FPCB | [2023/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING DISPLAY MODULE HAVING PLURALITY OF FPCBS | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN MODULE D'AFFICHAGE AYANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE CARTES DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ SOUPLES | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2023 | Translation filed | 14.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015043142 (JANG SUNGKWON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0159] *; | [A]CN109831551 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 1, 3, 4 *; | [XYI]US2020042131 (LEE TAE HEE [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0150] * * figures 1, 2, 4, 11, 12, 22, 24 * [Y] 7,15 [I] 4-6,8,12-14; | [Y]US2020220227 (KWAK WOONGEUN [KR], et al) [Y] 7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]KR20160085388 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0052] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]CN109831551 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-10 and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20190087216 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0069]-[0076] and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20190135811 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0035] and figure 3. *; | [A]KR20200002576 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0073] and figures 1-2. * |