EP4208745 - RESONANT DEVICE IMPROVEMENT IN PICS USING SPARE DEVICES TO REDUCE POWER REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciena Corporation 7035 Ridge Road Hanover, MD 21076 / US | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKEL, Michael, Y. Hanover, MD 21076 / US | 02 /
PELEKHATY, Vladimir Hanover, MD 21076 / US | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/28] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21870479.9 | 03.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021US49002 | Priority number, date | US202063074801P | 04.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063074801 P | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022081278 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4208745 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4208745 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/293, G02F1/01 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/29343 (EP,US);
G02B6/29382 (EP,US);
G02B6/29395 (EP,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G02F2203/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG EINER RESONANZKÖRPER EINES PICS DURCH VERWENDUNG VON ERSATZKÖRPERN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES ENERGIEBEDARFS | [2023/46] | English: | RESONANT DEVICE IMPROVEMENT IN PICS USING SPARE DEVICES TO REDUCE POWER REQUIREMENTS | [2023/28] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE DISPOSITIF RÉSONANT DANS DES PIC À L'AIDE DE DISPOSITIFS DE RÉSERVE POUR RÉDUIRE LES EXIGENCES DE PUISSANCE | [2023/28] |
Former [2023/28] | RESONANZVORRICHTUNGSVERBESSERUNG IN PICS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ERSATZVORRICHTUNGEN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER STROMANFORDERUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2012057866 (MCLAREN MORAY [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,11-13,15 * figures 6, 8, 10, 11 * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 25] , [0 41] , [0 43] , [0 55] * [Y] 4,7,9,10,14 [I] 5; | [Y]US2017214472 (CAPLAN DAVID O [US], et al) [Y] 4,7,9,10,14 * figures 1, 6, 17 ** paragraphs [0031] , [0 59] , [0 69] , [0 71] , [ 127] * | Examination | US2015381277 | by applicant | - LI, C.ZHOU, L.POON, A. W., "Silicon microring carrier-injection-based modulators/switches with tunable extinction ratios and OR-logic switching by using waveguide cross-coupling", Opt. Express, (20070000), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 5069 - 5076 | - S. DARMAWANY. M. LANDOBASAM. K. CHIN, "Nested ring Mach-Zehnder interferometer", Opt. Express, (20070000), vol. 15, pages 437 - 448 | - ZHOU, L.POON, A. W., "Electrically reconfigurable silicon microring resonator-based filter with waveguide-coupled feedback", Opt. Express, (20070000), vol. 15, page 9194 | - J. HONGY. ENAMI, "Modeling and analysis of microring resonator modulators with feedback waveguide coupling", J. Lightw. Technol., (20111200), vol. 29, no. 21, doi:10.1109/JLT.2011.2167742, pages 3243 - 3249, XP011363148 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2011.2167742 | - D. ADAMSA. ABOKETAFS. PREBLE, "Robust phase-shift keying silicon photonic modulator", Opt. Express, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 16, pages 17440 - 17447 | - G. ZHAO et al., "Tunable Fano resonances based on microring resonator with feedback coupled waveguide", Opt. Exp., (20160900), vol. 24, no. 18, doi:10.1364/OE.24.020187, pages 20187 - 20195, XP055870038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.24.020187 | - S. WANR. NIUH.-L. RENC.-L. ZOUG.-C. GUOC.-H. DONG, "Experimental demonstration of dissipative sensing in a self-interference microring resonator", Photon. Res., (20180000), vol. 6, pages 681 - 685 |