EP4221103 - PUBLIC CLOUD NETWORK CONFIGURATION METHOD, AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Cloud Computing Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Cloud Data Center Jiaoxinggong Road Qianzhong Avenue Gui'an New District Guizhou 550025 / CN | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Zhonghua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Rui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21871539.9 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021CN119867 | Priority number, date | CN20201129039 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011029039 | [2023/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063170 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4221103 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0895, H04L41/0806, H04L12/46, G06F9/455, H04L41/18, // H04L41/0894, H04L41/084, H04L61/5014 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (EP);
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/18 (EP);
G06F2009/45595 (EP);
H04L41/0843 (EP);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L61/5014 (EP);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR ÖFFENTLICHES CLOUD-NETZWERK UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/31] | English: | PUBLIC CLOUD NETWORK CONFIGURATION METHOD, AND RELATED DEVICE | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE RÉSEAU DE NUAGE PUBLIC ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2023 | Translation filed | 25.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2017180249 (SHEN JIANJUN [CN], et al) [Y] 5,13 * abstract;; figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0096] * [A] 1-4,6-12,14,15; | [A]US2019140895 (ENNIS JR JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract;; figures 1-9 ** paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0156] *; | [XYI]US10719369 (AITHAL ANIRUDH BALACHANDRA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12,15 * abstract;; figures 1-7 * * column 2, line 5 - column 24, line 65 * [Y] 5,13 [I] 6,14 |