EP4218841 - BONE IMPLANT HAVING POROUS MEMBRANE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Huayu Chuangxin Technologies Co., Ltd. 15, Leyuan Street Yanxi Development Area, Huairou District Beijing 101407 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Huayu Chuangxin TA-NB Science & Technology Co., Ltd. 15 Leyuan Street Yanxi Development Area Huairou District Beijing 101407 / CN | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yuzhong Beijing 101407 / CN | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21871612.4 | 24.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021CN120407 | Priority number, date | CN20201125357 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011025357 | [2023/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063243 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218841 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/06, A61L27/30, C25D11/26 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C25D11/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/56 (US);
A61L27/047 (EP,US);
A61L27/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/306 (EP);
A61L27/50 (EP);
C25D11/00 (EP);
C25D3/665 (KR,US);
C25D7/00 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | KNOCHENIMPLANTAT MIT PORÖSER MEMBRAN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/31] | English: | BONE IMPLANT HAVING POROUS MEMBRANE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/31] | French: | IMPLANT OSSEUX AYANT UNE MEMBRANE POREUSE, ET SA MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2023 | Translation filed | 17.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |