EP4219123 - DECORATIVE FILM-USE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND APPLICATION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soken Chemical & Engineering Co., Ltd. 29-5, Takada 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-8531 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEKAWA, Yuya Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1320 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21871941.7 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021JP25423 | Priority number, date | JP20200158628 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020158628 | [2023/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022064809 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219123 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/14, B32B27/00, C09J133/14, C09J7/22, C09J7/38 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
C08F220/281 (EP);
C09J133/14 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2405/00 (EP);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
C09J2203/354 (EP);
C09J2203/37 (EP);
C09J2409/006 (EP);
C09J2423/046 (EP);
C09J2423/106 (EP);
C09J2427/006 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP);
C09J2433/006 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/14, C08F220/34 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/34 (EP);
C08F220/281, C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (EP);
C09J133/066, C08L33/14 (EP);
C09J133/14, C08L33/14 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DEKORATIVEM FILM UND ANWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2023/31] | English: | DECORATIVE FILM-USE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND APPLICATION THEREFOR | [2023/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE À USAGE DE FILM DÉCORATIF ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | Translation filed | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10158616 (CHUO RIKA KOGYO KK, et al); | [A]JP2010077287 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]JP2017008222 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO); | [Y]JP2018159019 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK); | [Y]WO2019013130 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK [JP]); | [Y]WO2019150728 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2019112574 | JP6574109B |