EP4219247 - AIRBAG DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 44783 Vargarda / SE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Yoshiki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8580 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA Yutaka Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8580 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Müller Verweyen Patentanwälte Friedensallee 290 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21871973.0 | 30.07.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021JP28288 | Priority number, date | JP20200161575 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020161575 | JP20200196969 | 27.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020196969 | [2023/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022064841 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219247 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/207, B60R21/231 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP,KR);
B60R21/207 (KR,US);
B60R21/23138 (US);
B60R2021/0048 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/23146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | AIRBAGVORRICHTUNG | [2023/31] | English: | AIRBAG DEVICE | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 17.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2016088349 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2017030638 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [YAX]JP2019018593 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2019218013 (JOYSON SAFETY SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [A]JP2020501971 ; | [A]KR20200092449 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) | by applicant | JP2017019425 |