EP4219186 - REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC COMPOSITION AND REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC MICROCAPSULE PIGMENT ENCAPSULATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd 3-17 Midori-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot Corporation (also trading as Pilot Corporation) 6-21, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEMOTO, Hiroshi Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-8588 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Toshihiro Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-8588 / JP | 03 /
TSUNEKAWA, Tomoo Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-8588 / JP | 04 /
MORIGAKI, Yui Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21872357.5 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021JP34301 | Priority number, date | JP20200162379 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020162379 | [2023/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022065228 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219186 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B43K19/02, C09K9/02, C09D201/00, C09D11/037, C09D11/17, C09D11/322, B43K5/00, B43K7/00, B43K8/02, B43K29/02, C09D7/41, C09D7/63 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
B43K19/02 (KR);
B43K29/02 (KR,US);
B43K5/00 (KR);
B43K7/00 (KR);
B43K8/02 (KR);
C08K9/10 (US);
C09B11/14 (US);
C09B67/0097 (US);
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/17 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/322 (KR);
C09D5/021 (US);
C09D5/26 (EP,US);
C09D5/29 (US);
C09D7/41 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/63 (KR);
C09D7/70 (US);
B43K19/00 (US);
B43K7/02 (US);
B43K8/022 (US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1014 (US);
C09K2211/1022 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROME ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REVERSIBLES THERMOCHROMES MIKROKAPSELPIGMENT, DAS DIESE VERKAPSELT | [2023/31] | English: | REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC COMPOSITION AND REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC MICROCAPSULE PIGMENT ENCAPSULATING SAME | [2023/31] | French: | COMPOSITION THERMOCHROMIQUE RÉVERSIBLE ET PIGMENT EN MICROCAPSULE THERMOCHROMIQUE RÉVERSIBLE ENCAPSULANT LADITE COMPOSITION | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | Translation filed | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2006009837 (NSK LTD) [Y] 1-14 [X] 1, 3, 6-7, 10-11; | [Y]JP2010126549 (SAKURA COLOR PROD CORP) [Y] 1-14* examples 16, 18 *; | [YX]CN104846695 (JIANGSU WAMPOLET PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 [X] 1, 3, 6-8, 12; | [Y]JP2018531990 (THERMOGRAPHIC MEASUREMENTS LTD.) [Y] 1-14 * examples 1, 6 * | by applicant | JPS5144706 | JPS5144706B | JPS5144707B | JPH0129398B | JPH0417154B | JPH0733997 | JPH07179777 | JPH0839936 | JP2003253149 | JP2005001369 | JP2017101193 |