EP4192022 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Seunggi Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21872711.3 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021KR10559 | Priority number, date | KR20200123348 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200123348 | [2023/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022065681 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192022 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/466, H04N21/45, H04N21/258, H04N21/482 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H04N21/25891 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4668 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/251 (EP);
H04N21/435 (US);
H04N21/44204 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4622 (US);
H04N21/4662 (US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4826 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/23] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | Translation filed | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017280196 (THOMAS WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063]; figure 2x *; | [A]WO2019117547 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1,6,7 * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0146] *; | [XI]WO2020145596 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0087]; figure 1; claim 3 * [I] 10 | International search | [A]KR101755409B (SK PLANET CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15* See claim 2. *; | [A]KR101953305B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0012]. *; | [Y]JP2019101942 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [Y] 7,10 * See paragraph [0026]; and claim 3. *; | [YA]KR101998677B (KT CORPORATION) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * See paragraph [0032]; and claims 1 and 9-10. * [A] 9; | [Y]KR20200085597 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * See paragraphs [0019] and [0186]. * | by applicant | KR20200123348 |