EP4193474 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SWITCHING TRANSMISSION METHODS IN MASSIVE MIMO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ranran Beijing 100000 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Guangyu Beijing 100000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhigang Beijing 100000 / CN | 04 /
LI, Yan Beijing 100000 / CN | 05 /
HUANG, Qixin Beijing 100000 / CN | 06 /
LI, Yan Beijing 100000 / CN | 07 /
ZHOU, Tong Beijing 100000 / CN | 08 /
YANG, Xiaohui Beijing 100000 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21872982.0 | 27.09.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021KR13139 | Priority number, date | CN20201135428 | 27.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011035428 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022065954 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193474 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0452, H04B7/06, H04B7/0456, H04B17/318, H04B17/336, H04B17/391 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04B7/0689 (EP);
H04B7/0452 (KR,US);
H04B17/318 (KR);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04B7/0626 (KR);
H04B7/063 (KR);
H04B7/0632 (KR);
H04B7/0639 (KR);
H04L25/0224 (KR);
H04W52/365 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMSCHALTUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN IN MASSIVEM MIMO-SYSTEM | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SWITCHING TRANSMISSION METHODS IN MASSIVE MIMO SYSTEM | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION DE PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTÈME À MIMO MASSIVES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9912304 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-6,14,15 * page 9 ** page 24 - page 25 *; | [X]US2012236817 (CHEN YIJIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US2020145154 (BLACK PETER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14,15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [XA]US2020287639 (SU SHI [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0018] , [0039] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066] * [A] 10-13 | International search | [Y]US2012218913 (PARK KYOUNGMIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9,14-15 * paragraphs [0097]-[0098], [0101] *; | [A]US2017257156 (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0516]-[0524] *; | [Y]WO2017223201 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0049], [0083] *; | [YA]US2020228281 (CHOI SEUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9,14-15 * paragraphs [0061], [0075], [0100], [0128]; and figure 9 * [A] 10-13; | [Y]US2020287639 (SU SHI [US], et al) [Y] 4-9 * paragraphs [0018], [0031], [0036], [0039], [0052]; and figures 2-3 * |