EP4222265 - TREATMENT OF OPTIC ATROPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PYC THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 6 Verdun Street Nedlands, WA 6009 / AU | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Fred Nedlands, Western Australia 6009 / AU | 02 /
PITOUT, Ianthe Vale, Western Australia 6155 / AU | 03 /
GRAINOK, Janya Shenton Park, Western Australia 6008 / AU | 04 /
UTAMA, Sasiwimon Perth, Western Australia 6000 / AU | 05 /
RICE, Kim Beaconsfield, Western Australia 6162 / AU | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21873742.7 | 01.10.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021AU51154 | Priority number, date | AU20200903577 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: AU 2020903577 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067398 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222265 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7125, A61P27/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A61P27/02 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,IL);
A61K31/712 (EP,IL);
A61K31/7125 (AU,KR);
C12Y306/05005 (US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/314 (US);
C12N2310/321 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3233 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3513 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3525 (IL);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/11, C12N2310/314, C12N2310/3233 (AU);
C12N2310/11, C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (AU);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON OPTISCHER ATROPHIE | [2023/32] | English: | TREATMENT OF OPTIC ATROPHY | [2023/32] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'ATROPHIE OPTIQUE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2021231107 (STOKE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); |