EP4222619 - USER IDENTIFICATION WITH INPUT PROFILE RECORD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard Technologies Canada ULC 475 Howe Street 20th Floor Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 2B3 / CA | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGEE, Perry Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 2B3 / CA | 02 /
CHAN, Sik Suen Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 2B3 / CA | 03 /
LAPTIEV, Anton Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 0J7 / CA | 04 /
FRENTIU, Cristian Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 2B3 / CA | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21873770.8 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021CA51365 | Priority number, date | US202063085598P | 30.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063085598 P | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067436 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222619 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, H04L9/40, H04W12/68, H04W12/065, G06F21/31 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
G06F21/316 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP);
H04L63/0435 (US);
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
H04W12/065 (EP);
H04W12/68 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | G06F21/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | BENUTZERIDENTIFIKATION MIT EINGABEPROFILAUFZEICHNUNG | [2023/32] | English: | USER IDENTIFICATION WITH INPUT PROFILE RECORD | [2023/32] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEUR AVEC DOSSIER DE PROFIL D'ENTRÉE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015363785 (PEREZ KRISTOFER [US], et al); | [XI]US2018034859 (ARONOWITZ HAGAI [IL], et al); | [XI]US2020004939 (STREIT SCOTT EDWARD [US]) | International search | [A]US4805222 (YOUNG JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]WO9723816 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2004015714 (ABRAHAM MAGID [US], et al); | [A]US2004187037 (CHECCO JOHN C [US]); | [A]US2006224898 (AHMED AHMED E [CA]); | [A]US2006271790 (CHEN WENYING [US]); | [A]US2007067853 (RAMSEY MARK S [US]); | [Y]US2008306872 (FELSHER DAVID PAUL [US]); | [A]US7706574 (ROSS GORDON A [US]); | [A]WO2013006071 (CRITICAL SOFTWARE S A [PT], et al); | [A]US2013055381 (HAO CHEN [CN], et al); | [Y]US2015095028 (KARPEY DAVID [US], et al); | [XY]US2015363785 (PEREZ KRISTOFER [US], et al); | [A]US2018096354 (KOHLI MANONEET [US]) |