EP4203391 - INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Peng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21874315.1 | 22.09.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN119656 | Priority number, date | CN20201163107 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011063107 | [2023/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022068654 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203391 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/1095, H04L9/40, H04L65/40, G06F9/451, G06F9/54, G06F3/04883, // G06F3/04817, G06F3/0486, H04W4/80, H04L67/06 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G06F9/452 (EP);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F9/54 (EP);
G06F9/543 (EP);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | H04L9/40, H04L65/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ENDGERÄT | [2023/26] | English: | INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TERMINAL DEVICE | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INTERACTION POUR DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 16.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013086214 (JUNG SOO-YEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0062] - [0081] - [ 118] - [0126]; figures 3,9 *; | [XYI]US2016088480 (CHEN VINCENT WEI-KANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,12-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0095] * [Y] 9-11 [I] 5,7,8; | [Y]EP3232731 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 9-11* paragraphs [0118] - [0119]; figure 15 * |