Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
22.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
20.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.03.2024 | First examination report | |
06.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
01.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
01.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
28.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
13.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
03.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.04.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |