Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023380497 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202022220439 | 30.09.2020 | WO2021CN121781 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4223160 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2024 | A4 | EP4223160 | 09.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202022220439 | 30.09.2020 | WO2021CN121781 | 29.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022068889 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202022220439 | 30.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN214127021U | 07.09.2021 | U | Priority number | Date | CN202022220439 | 30.09.2020 |