EP4223160 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yinzhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Jun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
GONG, Weifeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
LU, Linhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
XIE, Yuanqiu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 06 /
HU, Ruilong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 07 /
XU, Zhongli Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 08 /
LI, Yonghai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21874544.6 | 29.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021CN121781 | Priority number, date | CN202022220439U | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN 202022220439 U | [2023/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022068889 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223160 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24F40/10, A24F40/40, A24F47/00, A24F40/485, A24F40/42 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A24F40/46 (US);
A24F40/51 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | A24F40/46, A24F40/10, A24F40/40, A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2023/32] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2023/32] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 02.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]CN110250582 (SHENZHEN SMOORE CO LTD); | [XAYI]CN209931491U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO); | [XAI]CN210203316U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO); | [A]CN210611013U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO); | [A]CN111329115 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD) |