EP4224125 - IMAGE ANALYSIS METHOD, IMAGE ANALYSIS DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Yoshiro Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21875075.0 | 03.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021JP32472 | Priority number, date | JP20200167388 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020167388 | [2023/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022070773 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224125 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/58, G01L1/00, H04N1/46, G01L5/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G01J1/50 (EP);
G01J3/50 (US);
G01J3/52 (EP);
G01J3/524 (EP);
G01L1/241 (EP);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | BILDANALYSEVERFAHREN, BILDANALYSEVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2023/32] | English: | IMAGE ANALYSIS METHOD, IMAGE ANALYSIS DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'IMAGE, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | Translation filed | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4078423 (OGATA YASUHIRO, et al) [Y] 9-11,13* column 6, line 23 - line 33 *; | [XYI]JP2001008220 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12,14,15 * paragraph [0023]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * * Equations (12) and (13) * [Y] 9-11,13 [I] 4,7 | International search | [YX]JP2001008220 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 9, 10 [X] 1-8, 11-13; | [A]JP2006339897 (UNIV TOKYO, et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]JP2020073907 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 9, 10 * paragraphs [0001]-[0006] * | by applicant | JP2012142920 | JP2020073907 |