EP4224576 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jin Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
IKEUCHI, Issei Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HIBINO, Mitsuhiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NAKURA, Kensuke Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21875195.6 | 14.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021JP33788 | Priority number, date | JP20200166184 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020166184 | [2023/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022070893 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224576 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/505, H01M4/525, C01G45/12, H01M10/052 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
C01B11/24 (US);
C01G45/1228 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/1315 (US);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/582 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/76 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | H01M4/505, H01M4/525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/32] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERIES, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/32] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2023 | Translation filed | 14.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 21.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018034042 (CARROLL KYLER [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7 * claim -; table 3 * [I] 2,3,6; | [XI]US2018090747 (NATSUI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * example 14; claim -; table 1 * [I] 2,4-6; | [X]US2019198861 (NATSUI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * examples 3,16; claim -; table 1 *; | [XI]US2019221838 (ISHIKAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * examples 12, 18; claim -; table 2 * [I] 2,5,6; | [XI]EP3595058 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * examples 12, 18; claim -; table 1 * [I] 2,5,6; | [XI]WO2020044653 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * example 2.12; claim -; table 8 * [I] 2,5,6; | [X]US10586981 (IKEUCHI ISSEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7* example -; claim - *; | [XPI]US2021143397 (UCHIDA SHUHEI [JP], et al) [XP] 1,3,4,7 * example 2.12; claim -; table 8 * [I] 2,5,6 | International search | [Y]JP2005011688 (TOYO TANSO CO, et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0002]-[0021] *; | [A]JP2005325000 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-7 ; | [YAX]WO2011016334 (AGC SEIMI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 3 [A] 4-6 [X] 1-2, 7; | [AX]WO2019003025 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [A] 4-6 [X] 1-3, 7; | [PA]WO2021171843 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7 | by applicant | JP6197029B |