EP4223168 - CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RELIVE Co., Ltd. 3-27-3, Chomeigaoka Izumi-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-3212 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states Shintaikinoukenkyuujo Co., Ltd. Omega Court building 102, 3-27-3 Chomeigaoka Izumi-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-3212 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takashi Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-3212 / JP | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21875836.5 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021JP36312 | Priority number, date | JP20200165720 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020165720 | [2023/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022071540 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223168 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00, A41D1/04, A41D1/08, A41D31/18 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A41D13/0015 (EP);
A41D13/00 (KR);
A41D27/08 (US);
A41D1/04 (EP);
A41D1/08 (EP);
A41D27/00 (KR);
A41D31/185 (EP);
A41H3/08 (KR);
B41M1/12 (US);
A41D2600/10 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | A41D13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | BEKLEIDUNG | [2023/32] | English: | CLOTHING | [2023/32] | French: | VÊTEMENT | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | Translation filed | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018025238 (REVENGE S R L [IT]) [Y] 11-14 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048]; figure - *; | [YD]JP6409143B (PHYSICAL FUNCTION RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.) [YD] 1-15 * description;; figures 10-17 *; | [Y]EP3141137 (WAVE COMPANY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10,15* paragraphs [0012] , [0035]; figure -; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2001226805 (GRD KK) [Y] 1-8, 10, 13-15* paragraphs [0007], fig. 1, 2 *; | [AY]JP6409143B (PHYSICAL FUNCTION RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.) [A] 9, 11-12, 16 [Y] 1-8, 10, 13-15 | by applicant | JP4061336B | JP6409143B |